|
10/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2933.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2102.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 1599.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|