California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2013

Amended

Bill June 24, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013