|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6534.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4710.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1826.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|