LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1340
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1340
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1340
Compare Versions
AB1340 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1340 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1340 Amended August 20, 2014
AB1340 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1340 Amended June 16, 2014
AB1340 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1340 Amended June 18, 2013
AB1340 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1340 Amended April 10, 2013
AB1340 Amended April 1, 2013
AB1340 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1340 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1340 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1340 Amended August 20, 2014
AB1340 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1340 Amended June 16, 2014
AB1340 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1340 Amended June 18, 2013
AB1340 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1340 Amended April 10, 2013
AB1340 Amended April 1, 2013
AB1340 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare