|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 559, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3122.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2258.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1217.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|