California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013