|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 141, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2472.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1694.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1345.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|