California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1392 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 29, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013