|
07/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5799.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4195.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|