California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 20, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014
Bill September 6, 2013