|
08/16/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1700.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1600.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|