California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1405 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/16/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1405CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 117 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 16, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 8, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Judiciary (Wieckowski (Chair), Alejo, Chau, Dickinson, Garcia, Muratsuchi, and Stone) MARCH 12, 2013 An act to repeal Title 5 (commencing with Section 35000) of the Corporations Code, relating to subversive organizations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1405, Committee on Judiciary. Subversive Organization Registration Law: repeal. Existing law, the Subversive Organization Registration Law, requires the registration of subversive organizations which are conceived and exist for the purpose of undermining and eventually destroying the democratic form of government in this state and in the United States. This bill would repeal these provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Title 5 (commencing with Section 35000) of the Corporations Code is repealed.