|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2790.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1985.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1479.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|