LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1419
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1419
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1419
Compare Versions
AB1419 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB1419 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB1419 Amended August 19, 2013
AB1419 Amended April 30, 2013
AB1419 Introduced March 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1419 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB1419 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB1419 Amended August 19, 2013
AB1419 Amended April 30, 2013
AB1419 Introduced March 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare