|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2936.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2106.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee May 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time. To print. (introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)
|
|
|