California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 30, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill August 27, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill June 11, 2013