Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28). Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4991.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4905.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4284.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|