LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1450
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1450
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1450
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 8, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 4, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 27, 2014
Compare
Bill
August 21, 2014
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2014
Compare