California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2014

Amended

Bill August 29, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 28, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014
Bill March 13, 2014