LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1522
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1522
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1522
Compare Versions
AB1522 Chaptered September 10, 2014
AB1522 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 29, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 18, 2014
AB1522 Amended June 15, 2014
AB1522 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1522 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1522 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1522 Amended March 13, 2014
AB1522 Introduced January 16, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1522 Chaptered September 10, 2014
AB1522 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 29, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1522 Amended August 18, 2014
AB1522 Amended June 15, 2014
AB1522 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1522 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1522 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1522 Amended March 13, 2014
AB1522 Introduced January 16, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare