|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 5839.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4953.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|