California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 6, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 12, 2014
Bill June 3, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014