Assembly | 04/28/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2014 | Read first time. To print. |