California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1524 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/09/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1524AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Waldron (Coauthor: Assembly Member Ammiano) JANUARY 17, 2014 An act to add Division 16.8 (commencing with Section 39100) to the Vehicle Code, relating to unmanned aircraft. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1524, as amended, Waldron. Unmanned aircraft: identification requirements. Existing federal law, the Federal Aviation Administration Modernization and of Reform Act of 2012, provides for the integration of civil unmanned aircraft systems, commonly known as drones, into the national airspace system by September 30, 2015. Existing federal law requires the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to develop and implement operational and certification requirements for the operation of public unmanned aircraft systems in the national airspace system by December 31, 2015. Existing federal law also prohibits a person from operating a United States registered aircraft unless that aircraft displays specified nationality and registration marks. This bill would require, beginning January 1, 2015, a person or  public or private  entity that owns or operates an unmanned aircraft, as defined, to place specified identifying information or digitally store identifying information on that unmanned aircraft. The bill would exempt model aircraft, as defined, from that requirement. The bill would make a person or entity that violates that provision liable for a civil fine not to exceed $2,500. The bill would authorize the Attorney General, a district attorney, county counsel, or a city attorney to bring an action to recover that fine, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Division 16.8 (commencing with Section 39100) is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: DIVISION 16.8 Unmanned Aircraft 39100. For the purposes of this division, both of the following definitions shall apply: (a) "Unmanned aircraft" means an aircraft that is operated without the possibility of direct human intervention from within or on the aircraft. (b) "Model aircraft" means an unmanned aircraft that is all of the following: (1) Capable of sustained flight in the atmosphere. (2) Flown within visual line of sight of the person operating the aircraft. (3) Flown strictly for hobby or recreational purposes. (4) Does not weigh more than 55 pounds. 39101. (a) Beginning January 1, 2015, a person or  public or private  entity that owns or operates an unmanned aircraft that is not a model aircraft within this state shall do  either   any  of the following: (1) Legibly and permanently affix, stamp, or mark on the unmanned aircraft, in a size that can be read by the naked eye without the use of magnification, identifying information that indicates each of the following: (A) The name of the owner of the unmanned aircraft. (B) The residential or business address of the owner of the unmanned aircraft. (C) The telephone number of the owner of the unmanned aircraft. (2) Store the information specified in paragraph (1) in a digital format on the unmanned aircraft. The digital information shall be stored in a manner that is readily accessible and retrievable.  (3) Legibly and permanently affix, stamp, or mark on the unmanned aircraft, in a size that can be read by the naked eye without the use of magnification, an address for an active Internet Web site that lists the information specified in paragraph (1).  (b) If a person or  public or private  entity that owns or operates an unmanned aircraft affixes, stamps, or marks on the unmanned aircraft pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (a), the person or  public or private  entity shall do so in a way that does not  to  modify or confuse the nationality or registration marks required by the Federal Aviation Administration. 39102. A person or  public or private  entity that violates the provisions of Section 39101 shall be liable for a civil fine not to exceed two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500). A proceeding to recover the civil fines specified in this section may be brought in any court of competent jurisdiction by the Attorney General, a district attorney, county counsel, or a city attorney. Revenue from any fines collected pursuant to this section shall be deposited into the general fund for the city, county, or city and county, that brought the case, or, if brought by the Attorney General, the General Fund of this state. 39103. This division is not intended to conflict with or supersede federal law, including rules and regulations of the Federal Aviation Administration.