|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6242.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4616.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5169.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|