California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014