California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 24, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014
Bill March 18, 2014