California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/15/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1535CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 326 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 7, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 14, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 1, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bloom (Coauthor: Senator Pavley) JANUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 4052.01 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacists. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1535, Bloom. Pharmacists: naloxone hydrochloride. Existing law, the Pharmacy Law, provides for the licensure and regulation of pharmacists by the California State Board of Pharmacy. Existing law, generally, authorizes a pharmacist to dispense or furnish drugs only pursuant to a valid prescription. Existing law authorizes a pharmacist to furnish emergency contraceptives and hormonal contraceptives pursuant to standardized procedures or protocols developed and approved by both the board and the Medical Board of California, as specified, or developed by the pharmacist and an authorized prescriber. Existing law also authorizes a pharmacist to furnish nicotine replacement products pursuant to standardized procedures or protocols developed and approved by both the board and the Medical Board of California, as specified. Existing law authorizes a licensed health care provider who is permitted to prescribe an opioid antagonist and is acting with reasonable care to prescribe and dispense or distribute an opioid antagonist for the treatment of an opioid overdose to a person at risk of an opioid-related overdose or a family member, friend, or other person in a position to assist a person at risk of an opioid-related overdose. This bill would authorize a pharmacist to furnish naloxone hydrochloride in accordance with standardized procedures or protocols developed and approved by both the board and the Medical Board of California, in consultation with specified entities. The bill would require the board and the Medical Board of California, in developing those procedures and protocols, to include procedures requiring the pharmacist to provide a consultation to ensure the education of the person to whom the drug is furnished, as specified, and notification of the patient's primary care provider of drugs or devices furnished to the patient, as specified. The bill would prohibit a pharmacist furnishing naloxone hydrochloride pursuant to its provisions from permitting the person to whom the drug is furnished to waive the consultation described above. The bill would require a pharmacist to complete a training program on the use of opioid antagonists prior to performing this procedure. The bill would require each board to enforce these provisions with respect to its respective licensees. This bill would authorize the California State Board of Pharmacy to adopt emergency regulations to establish the standardized procedures or protocols that would remain in effect until the earlier of 180 days following their effective date or the effective date of regulations adopted as described above. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4052.01 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 4052.01. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a pharmacist may furnish naloxone hydrochloride in accordance with standardized procedures or protocols developed and approved by both the board and the Medical Board of California, in consultation with the California Society of Addiction Medicine, the California Pharmacists Association, and other appropriate entities. In developing those standardized procedures or protocols, the board and the Medical Board of California shall include the following: (1) Procedures to ensure education of the person to whom the drug is furnished, including, but not limited to, opioid overdose prevention, recognition, and response, safe administration of naloxone hydrochloride, potential side effects or adverse events, and the imperative to seek emergency medical care for the patient. (2) Procedures to ensure the education of the person to whom the drug is furnished regarding the availability of drug treatment programs. (3) Procedures for the notification of the patient's primary care provider with patient consent of any drugs or devices furnished to the patient, or entry of appropriate information in a patient record system shared with the primary care provider, as permitted by that primary care provider, and with patient consent. (b) A pharmacist furnishing naloxone hydrochloride pursuant to this section shall not permit the person to whom the drug is furnished to waive the consultation required by the board and the Medical Board of California. (c) Prior to performing a procedure authorized under this section, a pharmacist shall complete a training program on the use of opioid antagonists that consists of at least one hour of approved continuing education on the use of naloxone hydrochloride. (d) The board and the Medical Board of California are each authorized to ensure compliance with this section. Each board is specifically charged with enforcing this section with respect to its respective licensees. This section does not expand the authority of a pharmacist to prescribe any prescription medication. (e) The board may adopt emergency regulations to establish the standardized procedures or protocols. The adoption of regulations pursuant to this subdivision shall be deemed to be an emergency and necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, safety, or general welfare. The emergency regulations authorized by this subdivision are exempt from review by the Office of Administrative Law. The emergency regulations authorized by this subdivision shall be submitted to the Office of Administrative Law for filing with the Secretary of State and shall remain in effect until the earlier of 180 days following their effective date or the effective date of regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (a).