|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6620.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4558.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 1838.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1728.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Alejo.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alejo.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|