LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB155
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB155
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB155
Compare Versions
AB155 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB155 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB155 Amended August 12, 2014
AB155 Amended July 2, 2014
AB155 Amended June 17, 2014
AB155 Amended June 9, 2014
AB155 Amended February 20, 2014
AB155 Amended May 29, 2013
AB155 Introduced January 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB155 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB155 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB155 Amended August 12, 2014
AB155 Amended July 2, 2014
AB155 Amended June 17, 2014
AB155 Amended June 9, 2014
AB155 Amended February 20, 2014
AB155 Amended May 29, 2013
AB155 Introduced January 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare