California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2014

Amended

Bill June 17, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014