LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1556
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Compare Versions
AB1556 Chaptered September 17, 2014
AB1556 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB1556 Amended June 17, 2014
AB1556 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1556 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1556 Introduced January 27, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1556 Chaptered September 17, 2014
AB1556 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB1556 Amended June 17, 2014
AB1556 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1556 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1556 Introduced January 27, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare