California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014