LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1585
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1585
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1585
Compare Versions
AB1585 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1585 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB1585 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1585 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1585 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1585 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1585 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB1585 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1585 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1585 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare