California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014