LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1599
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1599
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1599
Compare Versions
AB1599 Chaptered September 15, 2014
AB1599 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1599 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1599 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1599 Amended June 18, 2014
AB1599 Amended April 23, 2014
AB1599 Amended March 20, 2014
AB1599 Introduced February 5, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1599 Chaptered September 15, 2014
AB1599 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1599 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1599 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1599 Amended June 18, 2014
AB1599 Amended April 23, 2014
AB1599 Amended March 20, 2014
AB1599 Introduced February 5, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare