|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6514.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4823.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4971.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|