California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill August 13, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill March 18, 2014