|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4497.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 4940.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|