California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014