LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1678
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1678
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1678
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 12, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 3, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 26, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 20, 2014
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2014
Compare
Bill
June 4, 2014
Compare
Bill
May 1, 2014
Compare