LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1678
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1678
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1678
Compare Versions
AB1678 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB1678 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1678 Amended August 20, 2014
AB1678 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1678 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1678 Amended May 1, 2014
AB1678 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1678 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB1678 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1678 Amended August 20, 2014
AB1678 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1678 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1678 Amended May 1, 2014
AB1678 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare