|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 3072.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 1215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|