LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB169
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB169
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB169
Compare Versions
AB169 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB169 Amended September 3, 2013
AB169 Amended August 12, 2013
AB169 Amended June 24, 2013
AB169 Amended June 3, 2013
AB169 Amended April 1, 2013
AB169 Amended March 4, 2013
AB169 Introduced January 24, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB169 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB169 Amended September 3, 2013
AB169 Amended August 12, 2013
AB169 Amended June 24, 2013
AB169 Amended June 3, 2013
AB169 Amended April 1, 2013
AB169 Amended March 4, 2013
AB169 Introduced January 24, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare