|
09/20/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6351.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4705.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 4472.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|