California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014