|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 454, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4454.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4641.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|