California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014