|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6040.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4416.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 5327.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5218.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|