California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1698 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 28, 2014